Jugnauth, Anand (CPSO#: 74632)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2004