Jugnauth, Eleonora Maria (CPSO#: 70522)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Hansch, Eleonora Maria (used until: 04 Sep 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004