Jull, Laura Anne (CPSO#: 86187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Jacula, Laura Anne (used until: 13 Mar 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health Services
3500 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2H 8E9
Phone: 613-945-1111
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ANNE JULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JULL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017