Juma, Azim Fatehali (CPSO#: 70206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 Pharmacy Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1L 3G7
Phone: (416) 646-0830
Fax: (647) 748-0830
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4 The Market Place
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Canada
Phone: (416) 690-3412
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Azim Juma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Juma ( CPSO# 70206 )

Business Address:
4 The Market Place
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Phone Number: (416) 390-3412

Business Address:
501 Pharmacy Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1L 3G7
Phone Number: (416) 646-0830

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZIM FATEHALI JUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1998