Juma, Zulfikar Amirali Hassan (CPSO#: 28082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1650 Elgin Mills Rd. E.
Suite 201
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone: 905-883-8000
Fax: 905-883-9993
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

A & M Echo Doppler Inc
298 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2N 3B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 223-6500
Fax: (416) 223-6502
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zulfikar Juma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Juma ( CPSO# 28082 )

Business Address:
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Suite 201
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 883-8000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZULFIKAR AMIRALI HASSAN JUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1980