Jumah, Naana Afua (CPSO#: 89225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harvard Medical School, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P9A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Fax: (807) 346-6251
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naana Afua Jumah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jumah ( CPSO# 89225 )

Business Address:
Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAANA AFUA JUMAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUMAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013