Jun, Martin Chun (CPSO#: 74039)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
Ajax and Pickering Site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 1210
Fax: (905) 428-8277
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jun ( CPSO# 74039 )

Business Address:
Centenary After Hours Clinic
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 281-8618

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System - Aax/Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN CHUN JUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005