Junaid, Amjad (CPSO#: 67971)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Phone: (905) 388-2233
Fax: (905) 388-4999
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Hospital
Dept of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-4941 Ext. 38510
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amjad Junaid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Junaid ( CPSO# 67971 )

Business Address:
Suite 404
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Phone Number: (905) 388-2233

Business Address:
St Josephs Hospital
Emergency Department
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMJAD JUNAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNAID is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1996