Juneja, Romi (CPSO#: 78398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8500 Torbram Road
Unit 55
Brampton ON  L6T 5C6
Phone: (905) 460-4061
Fax: (905)461-3879
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Romi Juneja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Juneja ( CPSO# 78398 )

Business Address:
2000 - 55 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3L2
Phone Number: (416) 849-5555


Corporation Name: R. Juneja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2011

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 May 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROMI JUNEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNEJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 12 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005