Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Junn, Edward Houk Chun (CPSO#: 59696)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: Kim, Edward Houk Chun (used until: 28 Oct 1993 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Korean

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995