Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Junn, Fredrick Song Chun (CPSO#: 57151)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: Kim, Fred Song Chun (used until: 03 Jun 1986 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 31 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999