Junqueira-Duarte, Beatriz Lasmar Portilho (CPSO#: 93836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Estacio de Sa (Unesa), 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Beatriz Junqueira-Duarte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Junqueira-Duarte ( CPSO# 93836 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P3E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 869-1420

Business Address:
523 Causely Street
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 356-2265

Business Address:
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone Number: (705) 848-7181

Business Address:
Highway 540
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0

Business Address:
11 Meredith Street
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 368-2322

Business Address:
70 Meredith Street
Gore Bay ON  P0P 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 268-2262

Business Address:
725 Coursel Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Business Address:
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-8121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEATRIZ LASMAR PORTILHO JUNQUEIRA-DUARTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNQUEIRA-DUARTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015