Juravsky, Louis Isaac (CPSO#: 54211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
135 MacBeath Avenue
Moncton NB  E1C 6Z8
Phone: 506-857-5280

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
USA - California
USA - Minnesota
USA - New Hampshire
USA - North Dakota
USA - Oregon
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS ISAAC JURAVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JURAVSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985