Jurriaans, Erik (CPSO#: 68084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 43897
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southmount Medical Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Suite LLE
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 2V8
Canada
Phone: (905) 387-4551
Fax: (905) 387-1966
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Canada
Phone: (519) 426-0130 Ext. 1210
Fax: (519) 429-6892
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road Suite #103
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 828-2066
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Brantford Medical Imaging
Unit 102
260 Lynden Road
Brantford ON  N3T 5L8
Canada
Phone: (519) 756-9889
Fax: (519) 756-1535
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Jurriaans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jurriaans ( CPSO# 68084 )

Business Address:
Brantford Medical Imaging
Unit 102
260 Lynden Road
Brantford ON  N3T 5L8
Phone Number: (519) 756-9889

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 387-4551

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L9G 4P6
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Business Address:
Unit 103
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 828-2066

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIK JURRIAANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JURRIAANS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996