Jurt, Ursula (CPSO#: 71390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Cardiopulmonary Clinic
Unit 7
31 Centre Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2X7
Phone: (905) 455-3010
Fax: (905) 455-3011
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Heart Clinic
416 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1C2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3242
Fax: (613) 546-4487
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jurt Malhotra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Malhotra ( CPSO# 70370 )
Dr. U. Jurt ( CPSO# 71390 )

Business Address:
Brampton Cardio Pulmonary Clinic
7 - 31 Centre Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2X7
Phone Number: (905) 455-3010

Business Address:
Kingston Heart Clinic
416 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1C2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3242

Business Address:
Digestive Health Clinic Inc.
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 09 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. URSULA JURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JURT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001