Jury, Margaret Emily (CPSO#: 32837)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Podesta, Margaret Emily (used until: 21 Jun 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Student Health Services, University of Western Ontario, Room 11 UCC, Suite 1120, 1151 Richmond St, London, ON, N6A 3K7
Date Received: 06 Jun 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016