Justinich, Christopher James (CPSO#: 54304)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.J. Justinich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Patient Records can be obtained at the following locations: Kingston General Hospital/Hotel Dieu Hospital 76 Stewart Street Kingston ON K2L 2V7 Phone: 613-549-6666 Perth Smith Falls Hospital 33 Drummond Street West Perth ON K7H 2K1 Phone: 613-267-1500 Brockville General Hospital 75 Charles Street Brockville ON K6V 1S8 Phone: 613-345-5645 Belleville General Hospital 265 East Dundas Street Belleville ON K8N 5A9 Phone: 613-969-7400
Date Received: 26 Jul 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 16 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Aug 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016