Justino, Henri (CPSO#: 71589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Texas Children's Hospital
Pediatric Cardiology
6621 Fannin Avenue MC 19345-C
Houston TX  77030
United States
Phone: (832) 826-5600
Fax: (832) 825-0165

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRI JUSTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUSTINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1998