Juszczynski, Caroline (CPSO#: 100508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queens University
Cardiology
70 Barrie street
Kingston ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: (613) 533-6000
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

70 Barrie St
Kingston ON  K7L3N6
Canada
Phone: 6135336000
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE JUSZCZYNSKI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JUSZCZYNSKI is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. JUSZCZYNSKI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JUSZCZYNSKI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. JUSZCZYNSKI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JUSZCZYNSKI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JUSZCZYNSKI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018