Juurlink, David Nelson (CPSO#: 69280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room G - 106
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 3039
Fax: (416) 480-6048
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Juurlink and Kapral Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kapral ( CPSO# 65328 )
Dr. D. Juurlink ( CPSO# 69280 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite 14EN-215
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4642

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite g-106
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-3039

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID NELSON JUURLINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUURLINK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998