Juvshik, Alexander Karl (CPSO#: 71089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 340
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807) 345-5859
Fax: (807) 345-2385
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Juvshik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Juvshik ( CPSO# 71089 )

Business Address:
340 - 63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone Number: (807) 345-5859

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER KARL JUVSHIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUVSHIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2000