Kabasele, Karl James (CPSO#: 70387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
175 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1P7
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 77400
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARL JAMES KABASELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KABASELE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 14 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001