Kacheri Pathayappura, Smitha (CPSO#: 113906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 27 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Calicut University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SMITHA KACHERI PATHAYAPPURA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KACHERI PATHAYAPPURA is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. KACHERI PATHAYAPPURA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KACHERI PATHAYAPPURA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KACHERI PATHAYAPPURA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KACHERI PATHAYAPPURA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KACHERI PATHAYAPPURA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 05 Sep 2017 to 26 Nov 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

McMaster University, 27 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2017