Kachooie, Alireza (CPSO#: 51924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:Isfahan University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1911 Kennedy Road
Suite 200
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Phone: (416) 299-3800
Fax: (416) 299-6025
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alireza Kachooie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kachooie ( CPSO# 51924 )

Business Address:
1911 Kennedy Road
Suite 200
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 299-3800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 03 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIREZA KACHOOIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KACHOOIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1984