Kachroo, Umang Bhat (CPSO#: 70706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Kashmir University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albion Finch Medical Centre
Suite 106
1620 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 4B4
Phone: (416) 741-1500
Fax: (416) 741-1506
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

One Care Medical Clinic
1755 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1P 0A3
Canada
Phone: (416) 290-0361
Fax: (416) 290-5986
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UMANG BHAT KACHROO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KACHROO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1998