Kachur, Edward (CPSO#: 70165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Site
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 522-9884
Fax: (905) 522-2615
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Kachur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kachur ( CPSO# 70165 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 627-2454

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD KACHUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KACHUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2002