Kader, Hosam Eddin Hamed Abdel (CPSO#: 65685)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jul 1993