Kaderali, Zulfiqar (CPSO#: 82806)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Sciences Centre, Department of Neurosurgery, GB124, 820 Sherbrook Street, Winnipeg, MB R3A 1R9 Telephone: 204-787-7267
Date Received: 28 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015