Kadiri, Yahaya Zekeri (CPSO#: 30260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

York Medical Chronic Pain Clinic
17215 Leslie Street, Unit C
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 853-0404
Fax: (905) 853-3702
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAHAYA ZEKERI KADIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KADIRI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2010

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jul 2010
Summary:

 On July 14, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kadiri had committed an act of 
 professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the 
 Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Dr. Kadiri engaged in a shouting match 
 with a surgeon outside of the operating room, in front of other people, lasting for several 
 minutes.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar impose the 
 following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Kadiri's certificate of registration:

(i)	Dr. 
 Kadiri shall successfully complete, at his own expense, a College approved Communications Course 
 and shall provide proof thereof to the College.  This term, condition and limitation shall remain 
 in place until Dr. Kadiri has provided satisfactory proof to the College of his successful 
 completion of the approved Communications Course.

2.	Dr. Kadiri appear before the panel to be 
 reprimanded.

3.	Dr. Kadiri pay to the College costs in the amount of $3650 within 6 months of the 
 date of this Order. 

4.	The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 14, 2010