Kaegi, Andrew (CPSO#: 32161)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Otago, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenstone Health Centre
Suie B
2158 2nd Avenue
Whitehorse YT  Y1A 5N9
Phone: (867) 667-2136

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Dec 1996