Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kafato, Kirino (CPSO#: 17115)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Turkish

Education:Istanbul University, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Apr 1991
Summary:

 In April 1991, Dr. Kafato pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Kafato 
 guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee imposed the following 
 penalty:

1.	Dr. Kafato was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on 
 the Register.

2.	A one-day comprehensive review of Dr. Kafato's practice was to be conducted, 
 with emphasis on his prescription practices.  Such a review was to be made by a senior 
 psychiatrist, to be appointed by the Registrar.

3.	If the reviewing psychiatrist was satisfied 
 with the standard of practice of Dr. Kafato, and so notified the Registrar, then the matter would 
 be at an end.

4.	If the reviewing psychiatrist found that Dr. Kafato's practice did not meet an 
 acceptable standard, then he was to notify the Registrar, who would require Dr. Kafato to take 
 remedial courses as prescribed by the Registrar.

5.	If remedial courses were required, then this 
 matter would come to an end when those courses had been completed to the satisfaction of the 
 Registrar.

6.	The comprehensive review and any remedial programs were to be paid for by Dr. 
 Kafato.

7.	Dr. Kafato was to agree to the release of information regarding the present matter to 
 those reviewing his practice and to those organizing and conducting any remedial 
 courses.

8.	Should Dr. Kafato fail to fulfil these requirements to the satisfaction of the 
 Registrar within three months of the date upon which this Order became final, then his licence to 
 practice would be suspended until such time as the requirements were met.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 17 Apr 1991