Kafka, Henryk Peter (CPSO#: 29419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Newberry Street
Belleville ON  K8N 3N3
Phone: (613) 966-4377
Fax: (613) 966-4730
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Henryk Kafka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kafka ( CPSO# 29419 )

Business Address:
Weeneebayko Authority Health Area
19 Hospital Drive
P.O. Box 34
Moose Factory ON  P2L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Business Address:
Cardiology Services Group
18 Newberry Street
Belleville ON  K8N 3N3
Phone Number: (613) 966-4377

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRYK PETER KAFKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAFKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977