Kagoma, Peter Kyambadde (CPSO#: 61643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1990

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ganda

Education:University of Lagos, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone: 1 519 756 6400
Fax: 519 756 7343
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Canada
Phone: 1 905 768 3311 Ext. 1138
Fax: 905 768 8670
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Kagoma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kagoma ( CPSO# 61643 )

Business Address:
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6

Business Address:
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER KYAMBADDE KAGOMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAGOMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 8, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)