Kahan, Meldon Mayer (CPSO#: 50872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Substance Use Service
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7559 Ext. 6
Fax: (416) 323-7739
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Meldon Kahan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kahan ( CPSO# 50872 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 232-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELDON MAYER KAHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1983