Kahlon, Amrit (CPSO#: 85138)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2016