Kahn, Larry (CPSO#: 61563)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Kahn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013