Kahn, Michael Khubbab (CPSO#: 85650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Peshawar, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 2
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101


Corporation Name: Michael Kahn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
500 - 797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 507-7246

Business Address:
146 Oliver Street
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL KHUBBAB KAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2006