Kahn, Shoshanah Esther (CPSO#: 70596)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 12 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Spanish

Education:Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Sep 2006