Kahnamoui, Kamyar (CPSO#: 69006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Iranian, Persian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
General Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Room 607 6 North
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46320
Fax: (905) 577-1405
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GHA Surgical Centre
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-5743
Fax: (905) 575-7711
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamyar Kahnamoui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kahnamoui ( CPSO# 69006 )

Business Address:
607 - 237 Barton Street East
6 North
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMYAR KAHNAMOUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAHNAMOUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000