Kahr, Walter Hans Alfred (CPSO#: 68065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Haematology/Oncology
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7977
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER HANS ALFRED KAHR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAHR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1998