Kaila, Brinderjit Kaur (CPSO#: 86608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York Endoscopy
Unit B19
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 645-5145
Fax: (416) 645-1401
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Promed Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 302
1315 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: (416) 634-0001
Fax: (416) 634-0002
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brinderjit Kaila Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kaila ( CPSO# 86608 )

Business Address:
North York Endoscopy
Unit B19
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 645-5145

Business Address:
Suite 302
1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Phone Number: (416) 634-0001

Business Address:
113 - 2985 Drew Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 0A4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 02 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRINDERJIT KAUR KAILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAILA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2007