Kaila, Sanjeev (CPSO#: 71599)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Dec 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjeev Kaila Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2013

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  April 19, 2013
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On April 26, 2013, Bluewater Health notified the College that Dr. Sanjeev Kaila's privileges were revoked, effective April 19, 2013. On August 18, 2014, on agreement between the parties, the Health Professions Procedural Board set aside Bluewater Health's decision to revoke Dr. Kaila's appointment/privileges as Dr. Kaila no longer fulfilled the residency/practice requirements and was not eligible to maintain his appointment/privileges.

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 11, 2012
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On May 15, 2012, Bluewater Health notified the College that Dr. Sanjeev Kaila's privileges were temporarily suspended, effective May 11, 2012.
On April 23, 2014, the Health Professions Procedural Board reinstated Dr. Kaila's privileges subject to conditions.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Dec 2014

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 18, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Kaila has not practiced medicine in Ontario since November 2012.

Dr. Kaila was the subject of investigations by the College both with respect to his care and treatment of patients and his conduct.

In the face of these investigations, Dr. Kaila resigned from the College and agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario. No referral has been made to the Discipline Committee of the College with respect to these investigations; the investigations were not the subject of any findings by the Discipline Committee.