Kain, Brian Forrester (CPSO#: 24651)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Oct 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Brian Forrester Kain to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 15, 2016:

Clinical deficiencies in Dr. Kain’s practice have been identified. As a result, Dr. Kain has resigned from the College effective October 31, 2016 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.