Kain, Taylor (CPSO#: 106871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Oct 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street, Mcl 8-401
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-340-3155
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
South Africa

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Taylor  Kain shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate
                  medical education program in which Dr. Kain is enrolled at the University
                  of Toronto.

            (2)   In Dr. Kain's practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr.
                  Kain shall prescribe  drugs  only  for  in-patients  or out-patients of a
                  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with  the  department
                  where Dr. Kain  is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate
                  trainees are regularly  assigned by the department as part of its program
                  of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Kain's practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr.
                  Kain shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr.  Kain  may practise internal  medicine  and  to  the  extent  of  his
                  employment at St. Michael's Hospital, while under supervision coordinated
                  by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In Dr. Kain's  practice  specified  in  paragraph  (4),  Dr. Kain may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate  of  registration expires, and Dr. Kain must  thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when Dr. Kain is no  longer  enrolled  in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr.  Kain  no  longer  holds Canadian citizenship,  permanent
                        resident  status,  or a valid employment  authorization  under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically   converts  to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  Kain  must  immediately cease all practice
                  outside the postgraduate medical education program  if  any  one  of  the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the  supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of
                        any concerns  regarding  Dr.  Kain's  practice,  including  but not
                        limited   to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Kain's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval   for   Dr.   Kain  to  engage  in  practice  outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Kain's employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. Kain takes  a  leave  of  absence,  or  transfers to another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate  education program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the  event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate   Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Kain  may  not  resume  any  practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate  medical education program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy  until  Dr.  Kain  applies  for a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on October 20, 2017.  In  accordance  with
                  paragraph 6(a), this certificate  of  registration  expires  on  June 30,
                  2018.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice   outside   the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.