Kaiser, Ursula Brigitte (CPSO#: 56790)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 1994