Kaiser, William James (CPSO#: 59300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Street East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.J. Kaiser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Kaiser ( CPSO# 59300 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Street East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (416) 804-6218

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JAMES KAISER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAISER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1990