Kaizer, Leonard (CPSO#: 51416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5135
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kaizer & Friefeld Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kaizer ( CPSO# 51416 )
Dr. J. Friefeld ( CPSO# 51411 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
307 - 164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 457-8428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEONARD KAIZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAIZER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1983