Kajal, Dilkash (CPSO#: 88993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Munk Building
Room 1C 571
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3372
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kajal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kajal ( CPSO# 88993 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3372

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5801

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DILKASH KAJAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAJAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014