Kajdehi, Ali (CPSO#: 87802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: Khajehdehi, Ali Akbar (used until: 23 Mar 2016 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Isfahan University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Pain Clinic
Unit C8
2 Champagne drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 398-1515
Fax: (416)-398-1516
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5460 Yonge Street
Suite 204
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Canada
Phone: (416) 250-7171
Fax: (416) 250-0323
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Kajdehi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kajdehi ( CPSO# 87802 )

Business Address:
5460 Yonge Street
Suite 204
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Phone Number: (416) 250-7171

Business Address:
C8
2 Champagne Drive
North York ON  M3J 2C5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI KAJDEHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAJDEHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2010