Kakani, Nirmal Kumar (CPSO#: 87529)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Room C2 270
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3221
Fax: (519) 663-8803
Electoral District: 02

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2014